PA HB198 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-19)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 59-19)
Status: Passed on June 26 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-26 - Act No. 69
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, providing for Dyslexia Screening and Early Literacy Intervention Pilot Program.
Title
Providing for Dyslexia Screening and Early Literacy Intervention Pilot Program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-06-02 - Senate - Re-Reported as Amended (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 198 PN 2210, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - HB 198 PN 1924, 2013 A3016, O'NEILL (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - HB 198 PN 1924, 2013 A2938, TALLMAN (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-24 - House - HB 198 PN 2210, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - HB 198 PN 1924, 2013 A3016, O'NEILL (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-07-01 - House - HB 198 PN 1924, 2013 A2938, TALLMAN (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-26 | House | Act No. 69 |
2014-06-26 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-17 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-16 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-11 | House | Signed in House |
2014-06-11 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (197-0) |
2014-06-11 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-06-10 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-06-09 | House | In the House |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Re-reported as amended |
2014-03-12 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-02-04 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2013-09-26 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-09-24 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-09-24 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-09-23 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-07-01 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-07-01 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2013-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2013-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2013-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-06-04 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |