PA HB1974 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 30 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 20 (Decedents, Estates and Fiduciaries) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Title
In dispositions independent of letters, family exemption, probate of wills and grant of letters, further providing for payments to family and funeral directors.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1974 PN 3139, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1974 PN 3139, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-29 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-27 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-19 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-07-05 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-06-30 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-30 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2016-06-30 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-29 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-29 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-27 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-27 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2016-04-08 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |