PA HB1962 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-04-26 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in 911 emergency communication services, further providing for telecommunications management.
Title
In 911 emergency communication services, further providing for telecommunications management.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1962 PN 2249, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1962 PN 2249, FP (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-26 | Senate | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |
2022-04-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-13 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-12 | House | Removed from table |
2022-01-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-01-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-01-24 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-10-07 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |