PA HB1960 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-6)
Status: Passed on July 5 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-07-05 - Act No. 111
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of November 24, 1999 (P.L.884, No.54), known as the Prescribed Pediatric Extended Care Centers Act, further providing for definitions and for regulations.
Title
Further providing for definitions and for regulations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-06-19 - Senate - HB 1960 PN 2674, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - HB 1960 PN 2674, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-05-22 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-13 - House - HB 1960 PN 2674, FP (Y: 194 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-05 | Senate | Act No. 111 |
2012-07-05 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2012-06-26 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2012-06-20 | Senate | Signed in House |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2012-06-04 | Senate | Second consideration |
2012-05-22 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2012-04-30 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2012-03-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2012-03-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2012-01-09 | Senate | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE |
2011-12-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2011-12-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (194-0) |
2011-12-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2011-12-12 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2011-12-12 | House | Second consideration |
2011-12-07 | House | Removed from table |
2011-12-05 | House | Laid on the table |
2011-12-05 | House | First consideration |
2011-12-05 | House | Reported as committed |
2011-10-31 | House | Referred to HEALTH |