PA HB1959 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 30-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 1 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-05-18 - Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
Pending: Senate Intergovernmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for the administration of permits by State agencies, for a tracking system for permit applications, for the establishment of permit programs and for annual reports.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for the administration of permits by State agencies, for a tracking system for permit applications, for the establishment of permit programs and for annual reports.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-05-01 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3464, FP (Y: 112 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-05-01 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3163, 2017 A6710, MCCARTER (Y: 72 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3163, 2017 A6653, MCCARTER (Y: 172 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3163, 2017 A6588, DALEY (Y: 72 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3163, 2017 A6567, KRUEGER-BRANEKY (Y: 74 N: 111 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3163, 2017 A6135, BRADFORD (Y: 73 N: 112 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3163, 2017 A6133, BRADFORD (Y: 73 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [FAIL]
2018-04-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1959 PN 3163, 2017 A6676, ROTHMAN (Y: 188 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 14 N: 8 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05702 (Y: 7 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05701 (Y: 7 N: 14 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05700 (Y: 6 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05724 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05711 (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-18SenateReferred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL OPERATIONS
2018-05-01SenateIn the Senate
2018-05-01HouseThird consideration and final passage (112-75)
2018-05-01HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-04-30HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-04-30HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-04-16HouseRemoved from table
2018-03-13HouseLaid on the table
2018-03-13HouseFirst consideration
2018-03-13HouseReported as amended
2018-01-03HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1959
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1959&pn=2856
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1959&pn=3163
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1959&pn=3464
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1289
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1290
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1291
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1292
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1293
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=03/13/2018&RollCallId=1283
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1162
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1163
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1164
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1165
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1166
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1167
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1168
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=05/01/2018&RollCallId=1498
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1227

Bill Comments

feedback