PA HB1929 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 119 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 15-0)
Status: Passed on November 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-11-03 - Act No. 119 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in inchoate crimes, further providing for prohibited offensive weapons.
Title
In inchoate crimes, further providing for prohibited offensive weapons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-10-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1929 PN 2197, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1929 PN 2197, FP (Y: 202 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-20 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1929 PN 2197, FP (Y: 202 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-30 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-11-03 | Senate | Act No. 119 of 2022 |
2022-11-03 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2022-10-27 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Signed in House |
2022-10-26 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2022-10-18 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-09-20 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2022-04-26 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-04-26 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-1) |
2022-04-26 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-04-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-04-25 | House | Second consideration |
2022-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2022-03-30 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-03-30 | House | First consideration |
2022-03-30 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-28 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |