PA HB1926 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 20-9)
Status: Passed on May 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-04 - Act No. 19
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of State Route 2022, also known as Fort Washington Avenue, in Montgomery County as the SPC5 George W. Charters, Jr., Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of State Route 2022, also known as Fort Washington Avenue, in Montgomery County as the SPC5 George W. Charters, Jr., Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-24 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1926 PN 2793, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1926 PN 2793, FP (Y: 184 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-04SenateAct No. 19
2018-05-04SenateApproved by the Governor
2018-05-01SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-04-30SenateSigned in House
2018-04-25SenateSigned in Senate
2018-04-24SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-04-18SenateRemoved from table
2018-04-18SenateLaid on the table
2018-03-20SenateSecond consideration
2018-01-31SenateFirst consideration
2018-01-31SenateReported as committed
2018-01-26SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2018-01-23SenateIn the Senate
2018-01-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (184-0)
2018-01-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-01-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-01-22HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-11HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-11HouseReported as committed
2017-12-07HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2793
2017-11-16HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1926
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1926&pn=2718
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1926&pn=2793
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=38&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1161
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=966
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=01/23/2018&RollCallId=1226
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=01/31/2018&RollCallId=667
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=475

Bill Comments

feedback