PA HB1926 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-7-2)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-12-12 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act designating a portion of State Route 2022, also known as Fort Washington Avenue, in Montgomery County as the SPC5 George W. Charters, Jr., Memorial Highway.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designating a portion of State Route 2022, also known as Fort Washington Avenue, in Montgomery County as the SPC5 George W. Charters, Jr., Memorial Highway.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-11 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-12-12HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-11HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-11HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-11HouseReported as committed
2017-12-07HouseCorrective Reprint, Printer's No. 2793
2017-11-16HouseReferred to TRANSPORTATION

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback