PA HB1926 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-13)
Status: Enrolled on November 17 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-17 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on November 17 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-11-17 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general principles of justification, further providing for definitions, for use of force in self-protection, for use of force for the protection of other persons, for grading of theft offenses and for licenses to carry firearms; providing for civil immunity for use of force; and further providing for registration of sexual offenders and for sentence for failure to comply with registration of sexual offenders.
Title
In general principles of justification, further providing for definitions, for use of force in self-protection, for use of force for the protection of other persons, for grading of theft offenses and for licenses to carry firearms; providing for civil immunity for use of force; and further providing for registration of sexual offenders and for sentence for failure to comply with registration of sexual offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-11-15 - House - HB 1926 PN 4477, CONCUR (Y: 161 N: 35 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-14 - Senate - HB 1926 PN 4477, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-13 - Senate - HB 1926 PN 4412, A9735, LEACH AMENDMENT NO. A-9735 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-08 - House - HB 1926 PN 3854, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - House - HB 1926 PN 3800, 2009 A7447, TAYLOR, R. (Y: 179 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-14 - Senate - HB 1926 PN 4477, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 45 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-10-13 - Senate - HB 1926 PN 4412, A9735, LEACH AMENDMENT NO. A-9735 (Y: 20 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2010-06-08 - House - HB 1926 PN 3854, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-07 - House - HB 1926 PN 3800, 2009 A7447, TAYLOR, R. (Y: 179 N: 2 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-11-27 | Vetoed by the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-11-17 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-11-15 | Signed in House | |
2010-11-15 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-11-15 | Reported as committed | |
2010-10-18 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-10-14 | In the House | |
2010-10-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-10-13 | Amended on third consideration | |
2010-09-30 | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4412 | |
2010-09-28 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-09-27 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-09-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-22 | Removed from table | |
2010-07-03 | Laid on the table | |
2010-06-29 | First consideration | |
2010-06-29 | Reported as committed | |
2010-06-09 | Referred to JUDICIARY | |
2010-06-08 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-08 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-07 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-06-07 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-05-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-05-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-05-25 | Laid on the table | |
2010-05-25 | First consideration | |
2010-05-25 | Reported as amended | |
2009-08-12 | Referred to JUDICIARY |