PA HB191 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-9)
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 63
Status: Enrolled on November 13 2007 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 63
Summary
An Act providing for the donation of blood by certain persons 16 years of age or older; and making a related repeal.
Title
An Act providing for the donation of blood by certain persons 16 years of age or older; and making a related repeal.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2007-11-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2007-11-13 | Presented to the Governor | |
2007-11-13 | Signed in Senate | |
2007-10-31 | Signed in House | |
2007-10-30 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-10-29 | Second consideration | |
2007-10-17 | First consideration | |
2007-10-17 | Reported as committed | |
2007-05-02 | Referred to PUBLIC HEALTH AND WELFARE | |
2007-04-17 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2007-03-21 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2007-03-19 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-03-13 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-03-13 | Removed from table | |
2007-03-06 | Laid on the table | |
2007-03-06 | First consideration | |
2007-03-06 | Reported as committed | |
2007-02-01 | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=191 |