PA HB19 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 19-12)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-01 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-05-01 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in terms and courses of study, providing for child exploitation awareness education.
Title
In terms and courses of study, providing for child exploitation awareness education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - HB 19 PN 5, FP (Y: 177 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - HB 19 PN 5, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 95 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2013-02-06 - House - HB 19 PN 5, FP (Y: 177 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - HB 19 PN 5, MOT RECON, DERMODY (Y: 95 N: 100 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-01 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-04-16 | Senate | First consideration |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-02-08 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2013-02-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-02-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (177-18) |
2013-02-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-02-05 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-02-05 | House | Second consideration |
2013-01-23 | House | Removed from table |
2013-01-22 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-01-22 | House | First consideration |
2013-01-22 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-01-04 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |