PA HB1895 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 6, 1989 (P.L.169, No.32), known as the Storage Tank and Spill Prevention Act, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board.
Title
Further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1895 PN 2971, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A06135 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Senate Banking And Insurance: Reported as Committed (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1895 PN 2971, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A06135 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-24 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-07-13 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Removed from table |
2016-06-28 | Senate | Laid on the table |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2016-04-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-04-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (189-0) |
2016-04-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-03-22 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-03-22 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-21 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |