PA HB1893 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-25 - Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
Pending: Senate Health & Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of April 23, 1956 (1955 P.L.1510, No.500), known as the Disease Prevention and Control Law of 1955, further providing for confidentiality of reports and records.
Title
Further providing for confidentiality of reports and records.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Staats [R] | Rep. Robert Kauffman [R] | Rep. Francis Ryan [R] | Rep. Joe Hamm [R] |
Rep. Robert James [R] | Sen. Rosemary Brown [R] | Rep. Mark Gillen [R] | Rep. Seth Grove [R] |
Rep. Aaron Bernstine [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Barbara Gleim [R] | Sen. Frank Farry [R] |
Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-10-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1893 PN 2151, FP (Y: 113 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1893 PN 2151, MOT RECOM HEALTH, FRANKEL (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1893 PN 2151, MOT RECON, FRANKEL (Y: 87 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-09-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1893 PN 2151, FP (Y: 113 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-10-04 - House - House Floor: HB 1893 PN 2151, MOT RECOM HEALTH, FRANKEL (Y: 87 N: 113 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-09-29 - House - House Floor: HB 1893 PN 2151, MOT RECON, FRANKEL (Y: 87 N: 112 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-09-27 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-25 | Senate | Referred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES |
2021-10-04 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-10-04 | House | Third consideration and final passage (113-87) |
2021-10-04 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-09-29 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-09-29 | House | Second consideration |
2021-09-28 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-27 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-27 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-27 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-09-21 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |