PA HB188 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-06-22 - Referred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
Pending: Senate Rules & Executive Nominations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of June 30, 1981 (P.L.128, No.43), known as the Agricultural Area Security Law, further providing for definitions and for the purchase of agricultural conservation easements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for definitions and for the purchase of agricultural conservation easements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-06-17 - House - House Floor: HB 188 PN 1828, CONCUR (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A02129 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Bring Up The Bill For Consideration (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Adopt Amendment A02129 (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-16 - House - House Rules: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 188 PN 1757, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House Floor: HB 188 PN 180, FP (Y: 194 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-22SenateReferred to RULES AND EXECUTIVE NOMINATIONS
2015-06-17SenateIn the Senate
2015-06-17HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments, as amended by the House (189-0)
2015-06-16HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as amended
2015-06-10HouseReferred to RULES
2015-06-10HouseIn the House
2015-06-10SenateThird consideration and final passage (50-0)
2015-06-09SenateAmended on third consideration
2015-06-02SenateSecond consideration
2015-05-12SenateFirst consideration
2015-05-12SenateReported as amended
2015-03-06SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2015-03-04SenateIn the Senate
2015-03-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-1)
2015-03-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2015-03-02HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2015-03-02HouseSecond consideration
2015-02-26HouseRemoved from table
2015-02-10HouseLaid on the table
2015-02-10HouseFirst consideration
2015-02-10HouseReported as committed
2015-01-23HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2015&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=188
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0188&pn=0180
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0188&pn=1559
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0188&pn=1757
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2015&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0188&pn=1828
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=05/12/2015&rNbr=177
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=02/10/2015&rNbr=46
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=121
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/04/2015&rNbr=111
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=117
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/16/2015&rNbr=586
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/16/2015&rNbr=585
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/16/2015&rNbr=584
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2015&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=449
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=02/10/2015&RollCallId=46
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=03/04/2015&RollCallId=111
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=27&theDate=05/12/2015&RollCallId=177
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/16/2015&RollCallId=586
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/16/2015&RollCallId=585
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2015&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/16/2015&RollCallId=584

Bill Comments 750

feedback