PA HB1873 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act No. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on June 18 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-06-18 - Act No. 61
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act authorizing the release of restrictions on use and alienation imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act on certain land owned by the Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission in Benner Township, Centre County.
Title
Authorizing the release of restrictions on use and alienation imposed by the Project 70 Land Acquisition and Borrowing Act on certain land owned by the Pennsylvania Fish and Boat Commission in Benner Township, Centre County.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-05-06 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-18 | Senate | Act No. 61 |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-06-10 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-06-09 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2014-06-02 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-05-06 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2014-01-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-01-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-01-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-01-27 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-01-27 | House | Second consideration |
2014-01-15 | House | Removed from table |
2014-01-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-01-14 | House | First consideration |
2014-01-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-12-09 | House | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |