PA HB1865 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 37-9)
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-15 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 17, 1921 (P.L.682, No.284), known as The Insurance Company Law of 1921, providing for oncology benefit design.
Title
Providing for oncology benefit design.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-14 - House - HB 1865 PN 3885, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - House - HB 1865 PN 3590, 2009 A6548, GRELL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-06-09 - House - HB 1865 PN 3590, 2009 A6548, GRELL (Y: 193 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-15 | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE | |
2010-06-14 | In the Senate | |
2010-06-14 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-06-09 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2010-06-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-04-26 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-04-26 | Removed from table | |
2010-04-21 | Laid on the table | |
2010-04-21 | First consideration | |
2010-04-21 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-16 | Referred to INSURANCE |