PA HB186 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 42-4)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-03-17 - First consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for power of Governor during emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In size, weight and load, further providing for permit for movement during course of manufacture; and, in powers of department and local authorities, further providing for power of Governor during emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-17 - Senate - Senate Transportation: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 186 PN 154, FP (Y: 125 N: 77 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-17SenateFirst consideration
2021-03-17SenateReported as committed
2021-02-11SenateReferred to TRANSPORTATION
2021-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (125-77)
2021-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-28HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as committed
2021-01-21HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=186
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0186&pn=0154
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0186P0154.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=39
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=26
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=99
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=19&theDate=03/17/2021&RollCallId=58

Bill Comments

feedback