PA HB1837 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 95 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on December 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-22 - Act No. 95 of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 2, 1915 (P.L.736, No.338), known as the Workers' Compensation Act, in procedure, further providing for modifications, reinstatements, suspensions and terminations and for compromise and release.
Title
In procedure, further providing for modifications, reinstatements, suspensions and terminations and for compromise and release.
Sponsors
Rep. Rich Irvin [R] | Rep. Robert James [R] | Rep. Dawn Keefer [R] | Rep. Tina Pickett [R] |
Rep. David Rowe [R] | Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-15 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1837 PN 2394, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1837 PN 2394, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A02899 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1837 PN 2203, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A02436 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-15 - House - House Floor: HB 1837 PN 2394, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-12-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1837 PN 2394, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A02899 (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-10 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-10-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1837 PN 2203, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A02436 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-09-29 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-22 | House | Act No. 95 of 2021 |
2021-12-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2021-12-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2021-12-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2021-12-15 | House | Signed in House |
2021-12-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2021-12-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2021-12-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2021-12-14 | House | In the House |
2021-12-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2021-12-13 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-11-10 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-11-10 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2021-10-26 | Senate | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |
2021-10-25 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-10-25 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2021-10-25 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-10-06 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-10-06 | House | Second consideration |
2021-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2021-09-29 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-09-29 | House | First consideration |
2021-09-29 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-09-02 | House | Referred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY |