PA HB1821 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 25-6)
Status: Engrossed on December 13 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-01-02 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of November 29, 2006 (P.L.1471, No.165), known as the Sexual Assault Testing and Evidence Collection Act, further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for sexual assault evidence collection program; and requiring the Pennsylvania State Police to complete and submit a report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-12-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1821 PN 2777, FP (Y: 187 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-12-12 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-05 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A04917 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-02SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-12-13SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (187-0)
2017-12-12HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-12HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-11HouseRemoved from table
2017-12-05HouseLaid on the table
2017-12-05HouseFirst consideration
2017-12-05HouseReported as amended
2017-09-26HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1821
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1821&pn=2478
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1821&pn=2777
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1093
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=12/05/2017&RollCallId=1094
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/12/2017&RollCallId=1181
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=952

Bill Comments

feedback