PA HB1816 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 16-8)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 168
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of March 10, 1949 (P.L.30, No.14), known as the Public School Code of 1949, in preliminary provisions, providing for employment history review and for electronic public safety and criminal justice information; in certification of teachers, further providing for continuing professional development; providing for baccalaureate certification basic skills; and further providing for Pennsylvania School Leadership Standards.
Title
In preliminary provisions, providing for employment history review and for electronic public safety and criminal justice information; in certification of teachers, further providing for continuing professional development; providing for baccalaureate certification basic skills; and further providing for Pennsylvania School Leadership Standards.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-03 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 168 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (195-0) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-08 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-08 | House | In the House |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2014-06-18 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-06-03 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Referred to EDUCATION |
2014-01-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-01-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (200-0) |
2014-01-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-17 | House | Second consideration |
2013-12-16 | House | Removed from table |
2013-12-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-12-11 | House | First consideration |
2013-12-11 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-11-06 | House | Referred to EDUCATION |