PA HB1810 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-4)
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-19 - Referred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
Pending: Senate Community, Economic & Recreational Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 48 (Lodging and Housing) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in lodging, providing for hosting platforms.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In lodging, providing for hosting platforms.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1810 PN 3679, FP (Y: 177 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1810 PN 3569, 2017 A7265, HEFFLEY (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1810 PN 3569, 2017 A7264, HEFFLEY (Y: 195 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-06-12 - House - House Floor: HB 1810 PN 3569, 2017 A7261, HEFFLEY (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 18 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A07211 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-24 - House - House Tourism And Recreational Development: Adopt Amendment A07172 (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-19SenateReferred to COMMUNITY, ECONOMIC AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT
2018-06-13SenateIn the Senate
2018-06-13HouseThird consideration and final passage (177-14)
2018-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-12HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-12HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2018-06-05HouseRemoved from table
2018-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2018-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2018-05-24HouseReported as amended
2017-10-18HouseReferred to TOURISM AND RECREATIONAL DEVELOPMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1810
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1810&pn=2603
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1810&pn=3569
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1810&pn=3679
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=05/24/2018&RollCallId=1556
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=05/24/2018&RollCallId=1557
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=46&theDate=05/24/2018&RollCallId=1558
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1306
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1307
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1308
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1319
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=1664

Bill Comments

feedback