PA HB181 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 21-5)
Status: Passed on October 7 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-07 - Act No. 64
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending Title 34 (Game) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, further providing for powers and duties of enforcement officers and for resisting or interfering with an officer.
Title
Further providing for powers and duties of enforcement officers and for resisting or interfering with an officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-27 - Senate - HB 181 PN 1851, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - House - HB 181 PN 1851, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - House - HB 181 PN 1379, 2009 A1101, CUTLER (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-01 - House - HB 181 PN 1851, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-05-12 - House - HB 181 PN 1379, 2009 A1101, CUTLER (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-07 | Act No. 64 | |
2010-10-07 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-09-29 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-09-28 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-09-28 | Signed in House | |
2010-09-27 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-21 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-20 | Re-reported as committed | |
2010-03-08 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-01-26 | First consideration | |
2010-01-26 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-04 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES | |
2009-06-01 | In the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-05-12 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2009-05-06 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-04-01 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-04-01 | Removed from table | |
2009-03-31 | Laid on the table | |
2009-03-31 | First consideration | |
2009-03-31 | Reported as amended | |
2009-02-02 | Referred to GAME AND FISHERIES |