PA HB1799 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-11)
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-11)
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 79
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act designating the interchange at Exit 48 of Interstate 79 in Washington County as the Purple Heart Interchange; designating a bridge located on that portion of S.R. 3001 over the Chest Creek, Mahaffey, Clearfield County, as the Sergeant Major Morton Shea Landy Memorial Bridge; designating the Donora-Webster Bridge in Donora, Washington County, as the Lieutenant Governor Ernest P. Kline Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 130 over the Norfolk Southern rail lines, Trafford Borough, Allegheny and Westmoreland Counties, as the Trafford Veterans Memorial Bridge; and designating the interchange of Business Route 60 with Thorn Run Road in Moon Township, Allegheny County, as the Robert E. Harper Interchange.
Title
Designating the interchange at Exit 48 of Interstate 79 in Washington County as the Purple Heart Interchange; designating a bridge located on that portion of S.R. 3001 over the Chest Creek, Mahaffey, Clearfield County, as the Sergeant Major Morton Shea Landy Memorial Bridge; designating the Donora-Webster Bridge in Donora, Washington County, as the Lieutenant Governor Ernest P. Kline Memorial Bridge; designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 130 over the Norfolk Southern rail lines, Trafford Borough, Allegheny and Westmoreland Counties, as the Trafford Veterans Memorial Bridge; and designating the interchange of Business Route 60 with Thorn Run Road in Moon Township, Allegheny County, as the Robert E. Harper Interchange.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-10-04 - House - HB 1799 PN 4384, CONCUR (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 1799 PN 4384, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1799 PN 2335, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 1799 PN 4384, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1799 PN 2335, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-19 | Act No. 79 | |
2010-10-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-04 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-04 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-10-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-09-29 | In the House | |
2010-09-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-28 | Amended on third consideration | |
2010-09-27 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-20 | Removed from table | |
2010-03-15 | Laid on the table | |
2010-01-27 | First consideration | |
2010-01-27 | Reported as committed | |
2009-07-17 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION | |
2009-07-15 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-14 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-09 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-07-09 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-07-08 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-07-08 | First consideration | |
2009-07-08 | Reported as committed | |
2009-06-30 | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |