PA HB1780 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 34 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on July 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-07 - Act No. 34 of 2022
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of July 6, 1989 (P.L.169, No.32), known as the Storage Tank and Spill Prevention Act, in general provisions, further providing for definitions and for advisory committee; and, in financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board, for powers and duties of Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board, for Underground Storage Tank Environmental Cleanup Program and for Underground Storage Tank Pollution Prevention Program.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions and for advisory committee; and, in financial provisions, further providing for Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board, for powers and duties of Underground Storage Tank Indemnification Board, for Underground Storage Tank Environmental Cleanup Program and for Underground Storage Tank Pollution Prevention Program.
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Armanini [R] | Rep. Dan Moul [R] | Rep. Brian Smith [R] | Rep. David Zimmerman [R] |
Rep. Joseph Ciresi [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-06-30 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1780 PN 3274, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1780 PN 3274, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04364 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1780 PN 3134, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04278 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-30 - House - House Floor: HB 1780 PN 3274, CONCUR (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1780 PN 3274, Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04364 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-20 - Senate - Senate Environmental Resources And Energy: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 1780 PN 3134, FP (Y: 198 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-24 - House - House Environmental Resources And Energy: Adopt Amendment A04278 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-07 | House | Act No. 34 of 2022 |
2022-07-07 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2022-07-01 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2022-06-30 | House | Signed in Senate |
2022-06-30 | House | Signed in House |
2022-06-30 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (200-0) |
2022-06-30 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2022-06-29 | House | Referred to RULES |
2022-06-28 | House | In the House |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (49-0) |
2022-06-28 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-21 | Senate | Second consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | First consideration |
2022-06-20 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2022-06-10 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2022-06-08 | Senate | In the Senate |
2022-06-08 | House | Third consideration and final passage (198-0) |
2022-06-08 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2022-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2022-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2022-05-25 | House | Removed from table |
2022-05-24 | House | Laid on the table |
2022-05-24 | House | First consideration |
2022-05-24 | House | Reported as amended |
2021-08-12 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |