PA HB1780 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 22 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-09-08 - Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, providing for exemption of records from access.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, providing for exemption of records from access.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-07-13 - Senate - Senate State Government: Reported as Amended (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1780 PN 2370, FP (Y: 166 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1780 PN 2370, FP (Y: 166 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-08 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2020-09-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2020-07-13 | Senate | First consideration |
2020-07-13 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2019-10-31 | Senate | Referred to STATE GOVERNMENT |
2019-10-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2019-10-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (166-34) |
2019-10-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2019-10-21 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2019-10-21 | House | Second consideration |
2019-09-25 | House | Removed from table |
2019-09-18 | House | Laid on the table |
2019-09-18 | House | First consideration |
2019-09-18 | House | Reported as committed |
2019-08-30 | House | Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS |