PA HB1773 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-10-31 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 35 (Health and Safety) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in emergency management services, providing for tuition assistance for active volunteers; and establishing the Active Volunteer Tuition Assistance Program and Active Volunteer Tuition Assistance Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In emergency management services, providing for tuition assistance for active volunteers; and establishing the Active Volunteer Tuition Assistance Program and Active Volunteer Tuition Assistance Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-10-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Floor: HB 1773 PN 2763, FP (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-10-22 - House - House Floor: HB 1773 PN 2364, 2019 A3291, RIGBY (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-09-18 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-10-31SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2019-10-23SenateIn the Senate
2019-10-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (196-0)
2019-10-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-10-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-10-22HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2019-10-21HouseRemoved from table
2019-09-18HouseLaid on the table
2019-09-18HouseFirst consideration
2019-09-18HouseReported as committed
2019-08-30HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1773
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1773&pn=2364
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1773&pn=2763
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=09/18/2019&RollCallId=1029
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=720
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=744
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=10/23/2019&RollCallId=1263

Bill Comments

feedback