PA HB1769 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-25 - Second consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 66 (Public Utilities) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.
Title
In general provisions, further providing for definitions; in contract carrier by motor vehicle and broker, further providing for declaration of policy and definitions; and, in violations and penalties, further providing for unauthorized operation by carriers and brokers.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Day [R] | Rep. Dominic Costa [D] | Rep. Jerome Knowles [R] | Rep. Anthony DeLuca [D] |
Rep. Barry Jozwiak [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1769 PN 3142, FP (Y: 120 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06582 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To House Consumer Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To House Consumer Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1769 PN 3142, FP (Y: 120 N: 80 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-11 - House - House Consumer Affairs: Adopt Amendment A06582 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To House Consumer Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-27 - House - House Transportation: Re-refer Bill To House Consumer Affairs Committee (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-05-09 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-05-03 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-03 | House | Third consideration and final passage (120-80) |
2016-05-03 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-02 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-02 | House | Second consideration |
2016-04-13 | House | Removed from table |
2016-04-11 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-04-11 | House | First consideration |
2016-04-11 | House | Reported as amended |
2016-01-27 | House | Re-referred to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2016-01-27 | House | Reported with request to re-refer to CONSUMER AFFAIRS |
2015-12-19 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |