PA HB1755 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 3 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-19 - Referred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
Pending: Senate Agriculture & Rural Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of May 15, 1945 (P.L.547, No.217), known as the Conservation District Law, providing for legislative report.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for legislative report.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - House - House Floor: HB 1755 PN 2780, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Adopt Amendment A03328 (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-10-23 - House - House Agriculture And Rural Affairs: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-19SenateReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS
2020-02-03SenateIn the Senate
2020-02-03HouseThird consideration and final passage (195-0)
2020-02-03HouseRe-reported as committed
2020-01-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-01-22HouseSecond consideration
2020-01-21HouseRemoved from table
2020-01-14HouseLaid on the table
2020-01-14HouseRemoved from table
2019-10-23HouseLaid on the table
2019-10-23HouseFirst consideration
2019-10-23HouseReported as amended
2019-08-16HouseReferred to AGRICULTURE AND RURAL AFFAIRS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1755
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1755&pn=2346
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1755&pn=2780
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=10/23/2019&RollCallId=1243
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=2&theDate=10/23/2019&RollCallId=1242
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1091
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/03/2020&RollCallId=1691

Bill Comments

feedback