PA HB1740 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 18-5)
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 6 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-10 - Referred to TRANSPORTATION
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 75 (Vehicles) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in miscellaneous provisions, further providing for police reports.
Title
In miscellaneous provisions, further providing for police reports.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-06 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1740 PN 3429, FP (Y: 172 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1740 PN 2619, 2015 A7657, DIAMOND (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Floor: HB 1740 PN 3429, FP (Y: 172 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2016-05-25 - House - House Floor: HB 1740 PN 2619, 2015 A7657, DIAMOND (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Transportation: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-10 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2016-06-06 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-06 | House | Third consideration and final passage (172-17) |
2016-06-06 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-25 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-25 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2016-03-23 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-14 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-14 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-14 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-12-05 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |