PA HB174 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 30-13)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for patient access to diagnostics and treatments for Lyme disease and related tick-borne illnesses; and requiring health care policies to provide certain coverage.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-23 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House Floor: HB 174 PN 138, FP (Y: 188 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2017-05-23SenateIn the Senate
2017-05-23HouseThird consideration and final passage (188-6)
2017-05-23HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-05-22HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-05-22HouseSecond consideration
2017-05-10HouseRemoved from table
2017-05-09HouseLaid on the table
2017-05-09HouseFirst consideration
2017-05-09HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback