PA HB1739 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 14-1)
Status: Engrossed on September 27 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-10-03 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for direct primary care, medical service agreements and insurance, for medical service agreement requirements, for use of health savings accounts or flexible spending accounts and for use of other health care practitioners.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for direct primary care, medical service agreements and insurance, for medical service agreement requirements, for use of health savings accounts or flexible spending accounts and for use of other health care practitioners.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-09-27 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-09-27 - House - House Floor: HB 1739 PN 2336, FP (Y: 189 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-09-13 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-10-03SenateReferred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
2017-09-27SenateIn the Senate
2017-09-27HouseThird consideration and final passage (189-0)
2017-09-27HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-09-26HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-09-26HouseSecond consideration
2017-09-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-09-13HouseLaid on the table
2017-09-13HouseFirst consideration
2017-09-13HouseReported as committed
2017-08-24HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback