PA HB1707 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-07 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-02-07 - Act No. 14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 3100 over Interstate 83 in Springfield Township, York County, as the Rodney P. Miller Memorial Bridge.
Title
Designating a bridge on that portion of S.R. 3100 over Interstate 83 in Springfield Township, York County, as the Rodney P. Miller Memorial Bridge.
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Miller [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-14 - Senate - Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1707 PN 2390, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-12-16 - House - HB 1707 PN 2390, FP (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-02-07 | Senate | Act No. 14 |
2014-02-07 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Signed in House |
2014-01-29 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (48-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-01-14 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2013-12-23 | Senate | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |
2013-12-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2013-12-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-0) |
2013-12-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2013-12-11 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2013-12-11 | House | Second consideration |
2013-12-10 | House | Removed from table |
2013-11-13 | House | Laid on the table |
2013-11-13 | House | First consideration |
2013-11-13 | House | Reported as committed |
2013-09-26 | House | Referred to TRANSPORTATION |