PA HB1705 | 2007-2008 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-6)
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 43
Status: Enrolled on July 4 2008 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 1969-12-31 - Act No. 43
Summary
An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Compact; providing for the form of the compact; imposing additional powers and duties on the Governor, the Secretary of the Commonwealth, the Department of Environmental Protection, the Environmental Quality Board and the Compact; and imposing penalties.
Title
An Act authorizing the Commonwealth of Pennsylvania to join the Great Lakes-St. Lawrence River Basin Water Resources Compact; providing for the form of the compact; imposing additional powers and duties on the Governor, the Secretary of the Commonwealth, the Department of Environmental Protection, the Environmental Quality Board and the Compact; and imposing penalties.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2008-07-04 | Approved by the Governor | |
2008-07-04 | Presented to the Governor | |
2008-07-03 | Signed in Senate | |
2008-07-03 | Signed in House | |
2008-07-03 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-07-02 | Second consideration | |
2008-07-02 | Re-reported as committed | |
2008-06-16 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2008-06-10 | First consideration | |
2008-06-10 | Reported as committed | |
2008-02-04 | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2008-01-28 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2008-01-17 | Second consideration, with amendments | |
2008-01-14 | Re-reported as committed | |
2007-12-13 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2007-12-13 | Removed from table | |
2007-12-12 | Laid on the table | |
2007-12-12 | First consideration | |
2007-12-12 | Reported as committed | |
2007-11-19 | Re-referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2007-11-19 | Reported with request to re-refer to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY | |
2007-07-06 | Referred to INTERGOVERNMENTAL AFFAIRS |
Pennsylvania State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2007&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1705 |