PA HB1704 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-10-26 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 23, 1945 (P.L.913, No.367), known as the Engineer, Land Surveyor and Geologist Registration Law, further providing for definitions, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.
Title
Further providing for definitions, for continuing professional competency requirements and for exemption from licensure and registration.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Mustio [R] | Rep. Robert Godshall [R] | Rep. David Millard [R] | Rep. Jason Ortitay [R] |
Rep. Mark Cohen [D] | Rep. Christopher Sainato [D] | Rep. William Kortz [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-10-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1704 PN 2972, FP (Y: 187 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended A05938 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A05938 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-18 - Senate - Senate Consumer Protection And Professional Licensure: Reported as Committed (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1704 PN 2972, FP (Y: 187 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Professional Licensure: Report Bill As Amended A05938 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-16 - House - House Professional Licensure: Adopt Amendment A05938 (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Re-reported as committed |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-10-25 | Senate | Second consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | First consideration |
2016-10-18 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2016-05-26 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2016-05-18 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-05-18 | House | Third consideration and final passage (187-3) |
2016-05-18 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-05-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-05-17 | House | Second consideration |
2016-03-21 | House | Removed from table |
2016-03-16 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-03-16 | House | First consideration |
2016-03-16 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-11-16 | House | Referred to PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |