PA HB17 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 8 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-06-11 - Removed from table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending the act of April 14, 1972 (P.L.221, No.63), known as the Pennsylvania Drug and Alcohol Abuse Control Act, further providing for confidentiality of records and for consent of minor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Further providing for confidentiality of records and for consent of minor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Health And Human Services: Reported as Amended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - House - House Floor: HB 17 PN 398, FP (Y: 199 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 17 PN 33, 2017 A153, HAHN (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Floor: HB 17 PN 33, 2017 A151, HAHN (Y: 200 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-01-24 - House - House Health: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-11SenateRemoved from table
2018-06-11SenateLaid on the table
2018-04-23SenateRemoved from table
2017-07-08SenateLaid on the table (Pursuant to Senate Rule 9)
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as amended
2017-02-15SenateReferred to HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES
2017-02-08SenateIn the Senate
2017-02-08HouseThird consideration and final passage (199-0)
2017-02-08HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-02-07HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-02-07HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2017-01-25HouseRemoved from table
2017-01-25HouseLaid on the table
2017-01-25HouseFirst consideration
2017-01-25HouseReported as committed
2017-01-23HouseReferred to HEALTH

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=17
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0017&pn=0033
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0017&pn=0398
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0017&pn=2003
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=55&theDate=01/24/2017&RollCallId=3
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=20
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=21
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=41
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/08/2017&RollCallId=65
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=33&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=258

Bill Comments

feedback