PA HB168 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 22-10)
Status: Passed on June 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-27 - Act No. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in proprietary and official rights, further providing for wearing of uniforms and insignia.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In proprietary and official rights, further providing for wearing of uniforms and insignia.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 168 PN 132, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-13 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House Floor: HB 168 PN 132, FP (Y: 190 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-07 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Re-refer Bill To Another Committee (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-27SenateAct No. 9
2017-06-27SenateApproved by the Governor
2017-06-21SenatePresented to the Governor
2017-06-21SenateSigned in Senate
2017-06-21SenateSigned in House
2017-06-20SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2017-06-14SenateSecond consideration
2017-06-13SenateFirst consideration
2017-06-13SenateReported as committed
2017-05-04SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2017-04-26SenateIn the Senate
2017-04-26HouseThird consideration and final passage (190-0)
2017-04-26HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-04-25HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-04-25HouseSecond consideration
2017-04-24HouseRemoved from table
2017-04-19HouseLaid on the table
2017-04-19HouseFirst consideration
2017-04-19HouseReported as committed
2017-02-07HouseRe-referred to JUDICIARY
2017-02-07HouseReported with request to re-refer to JUDICIARY
2017-01-23HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=168
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0168&pn=0132
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=02/07/2017&RollCallId=42
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=04/19/2017&RollCallId=261
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=300
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=04/26/2017&RollCallId=316
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=06/13/2017&RollCallId=265
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=158

Bill Comments 750

feedback