PA HB1658 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-3)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-10-19 - Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE
Pending: Senate Consumer Protection & Professional Licensure Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of December 17, 1968 (P.L.1224, No.387), known as the Unfair Trade Practices and Consumer Protection Law, prohibiting speculative ticketing acts or practices.
Title
Prohibiting speculative ticketing acts or practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1658 PN 2087, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Adopt Amendment A02147 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1658 PN 2087, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 201 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-10-03 - House - House Consumer Protection, Technology And Utilities: Adopt Amendment A02147 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-19 | Senate | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION AND PROFESSIONAL LICENSURE |
2023-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2023-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (201-2) |
2023-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2023-10-16 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2023-10-16 | House | Second consideration |
2023-10-05 | House | Removed from table |
2023-10-03 | House | Laid on the table |
2023-10-03 | House | First consideration |
2023-10-03 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-09-05 | House | Referred to CONSUMER PROTECTION, TECHNOLOGY AND UTILITIES |