PA HB1641 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on June 13 2018 - 75% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Presented to the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act providing for competitive integrated employment in State and county agencies and any entity providing publicly funded education, training, employment and related services and long-term services and supports for working-age Pennsylvanians with a disability; establishing Employment First, the Governor's Cabinet for People with Disabilities and the Employment First Oversight Commission and providing for their powers and duties; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Governor and the Office of the Governor.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Providing for competitive integrated employment in State and county agencies and any entity providing publicly funded education, training, employment and related services and long-term services and supports for working-age Pennsylvanians with a disability; establishing Employment First, the Governor's Cabinet for People with Disabilities and the Employment First Oversight Commission and providing for their powers and duties; and conferring powers and imposing duties on the Governor and the Office of the Governor.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1641 PN 2734, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-05 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-11 - House - House Floor: HB 1641 PN 2734, FP (Y: 191 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-20 - House - House Labor And Industry: Adopt Amendment A04760 (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13SenatePresented to the Governor
2018-06-13SenateSigned in Senate
2018-06-13SenateSigned in House
2018-06-12SenateThird consideration and final passage (49-0)
2018-06-11SenateRe-reported as committed
2018-06-06SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2018-06-06SenateSecond consideration
2018-06-05SenateFirst consideration
2018-06-05SenateReported as committed
2018-01-02SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2017-12-11SenateIn the Senate
2017-12-11HouseThird consideration and final passage (191-0)
2017-12-11HouseRe-reported as committed
2017-12-06HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2017-12-06HouseSecond consideration
2017-12-05HouseRemoved from table
2017-11-20HouseLaid on the table
2017-11-20HouseFirst consideration
2017-11-20HouseReported as amended
2017-06-29HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1641
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1641&pn=2192
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1641&pn=2734
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1053
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=11/20/2017&RollCallId=1054
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=904
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=12/11/2017&RollCallId=1131
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=06/05/2018&RollCallId=899
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/11/2018&RollCallId=914
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2017&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=548

Bill Comments

feedback