PA HB164 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-06-11 - Referred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
Pending: Senate Veterans Affairs & Emergency Preparedness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 51 (Military Affairs) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Department of Military Affairs, providing for burial benefits.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Department of Military Affairs, providing for burial benefits.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-06-09 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-09 - House - House Floor: HB 164 PN 1723, FP (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 164 PN 132, 2021 A1211, C. WILLIAMS (Y: 203 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-08 - House - House Floor: HB 164 PN 132, 2021 A1211, SUSP RULES, C. WILLIAMS (Y: 199 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - House - House Veterans Affairs And Emergency Preparedness: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-06-11SenateReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS
2021-06-09SenateIn the Senate
2021-06-09HouseThird consideration and final passage (201-0)
2021-06-09HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-06-08HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-06-08HouseSecond consideration, with amendments
2021-06-07HouseRemoved from table
2021-05-24HouseLaid on the table
2021-05-24HouseFirst consideration
2021-05-24HouseReported as committed
2021-01-14HouseReferred to VETERANS AFFAIRS AND EMERGENCY PREPAREDNESS

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=164
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0164&pn=0132
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0164&pn=1723
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0164P1723.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=42&theDate=05/24/2021&RollCallId=449
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=280
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=281
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=313
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/09/2021&RollCallId=591

Bill Comments

feedback