PA HB1601 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 10-6)
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 28 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-10-30 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Titles 18 (Crimes and Offenses) and 42 (Judiciary and Judicial Procedure) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in minors, further providing for sentencing and penalties for trafficking drugs to minors and for drug-free school zones; in other offenses, further providing for drug trafficking sentencing and penalties; in sentencing authority, further providing for sentences for offenses committed on public transportation, for sentences for offenses against elderly persons, for sentences for offenses against infant persons and for sentences for offenses committed while impersonating a law enforcement officer.
Title
In minors, further providing for sentencing and penalties for trafficking drugs to minors and for drug-free school zones; in other offenses, further providing for drug trafficking sentencing and penalties; in sentencing authority, further providing for sentences for offenses committed on public transportation, for sentences for offenses against elderly persons, for sentences for offenses against infant persons and for sentences for offenses committed while impersonating a law enforcement officer.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2455, FP (Y: 143 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2455, MOT TABLE, SIMS (Y: 67 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2455, MOT RECOM, FRANKEL (Y: 65 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2408, 2015 A3700, MARSICO (Y: 133 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03600 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03600 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2455, FP (Y: 143 N: 54 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2455, MOT TABLE, SIMS (Y: 67 N: 130 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-10-28 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2455, MOT RECOM, FRANKEL (Y: 65 N: 132 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2015-10-26 - House - House Floor: HB 1601 PN 2408, 2015 A3700, MARSICO (Y: 133 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03600 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Adopt Amendment A03600 (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-10-20 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-10-30 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2015-10-28 | Senate | In the Senate |
2015-10-28 | House | Third consideration and final passage (143-54) |
2015-10-28 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2015-10-26 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2015-10-26 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2015-10-20 | House | Removed from table |
2015-10-20 | House | Laid on the table |
2015-10-20 | House | First consideration |
2015-10-20 | House | Reported as amended |
2015-10-05 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |