PA HB157 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Act No. 5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

An Act repealing the act of July 1, 1978 (P.L.584, No.109), entitled "An act establishing an agency to create the linkage necessary for the planning of an economic development system for Pennsylvania, and making an appropriation."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Repealing the act of July 1, 1978 (P.L.584, No.109), entitled "An act establishing an agency to create the linkage necessary for the planning of an economic development system for Pennsylvania, and making an appropriation."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 157 PN 122, Final Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Labor And Industry: Reported as Committed (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-04 - House - House Floor: HB 157 PN 122, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Labor And Industry: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23SenateAct No. 5
2021-03-23SenateApproved by the Governor
2021-03-17SenatePresented to the Governor
2021-03-17SenateSigned in Senate
2021-03-17SenateSigned in House
2021-03-16SenateThird consideration and final passage (48-0)
2021-03-15SenateSecond consideration
2021-02-23SenateFirst consideration
2021-02-23SenateReported as committed
2021-02-11SenateReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY
2021-02-04SenateIn the Senate
2021-02-04HouseThird consideration and final passage (202-0)
2021-02-04HouseRe-reported as committed
2021-02-03HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2021-02-03HouseSecond consideration
2021-01-28HouseRemoved from table
2021-01-27HouseLaid on the table
2021-01-27HouseFirst consideration
2021-01-27HouseReported as committed
2021-01-13HouseReferred to LABOR AND INDUSTRY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2021&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=157
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2021&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=0157&pn=0122
Supplementhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/WU01/LI/BI/FN/2021/0/HB0157P0122.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=26&theDate=01/27/2021&RollCallId=37
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=27
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=02/04/2021&RollCallId=97
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2021&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=13&theDate=02/23/2021&RollCallId=35
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2021&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=52

Bill Comments

feedback