PA HB1565 | 2013-2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-3)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 37-3)
Status: Passed on October 22 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-10-22 - Act No. 162
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending the act of June 22, 1937 (P.L.1987, No.394), known as The Clean Streams Law, further providing for potential pollution.
Title
Further providing for potential pollution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-10-06 - Senate - Reported as Amended (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-10-22 | House | Act No. 162 |
2014-10-22 | House | Approved by the Governor |
2014-10-16 | House | Presented to the Governor |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in Senate |
2014-10-15 | House | Signed in House |
2014-10-15 | House | House concurred in Senate amendments (118-79) |
2014-10-15 | House | Re-reported on concurrence, as committed |
2014-10-15 | House | Referred to RULES |
2014-10-14 | House | In the House |
2014-10-14 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (27-22) |
2014-10-08 | Senate | Second consideration |
2014-10-07 | Senate | Corrective Reprint, Printer's No. 4258 |
2014-10-06 | Senate | First consideration |
2014-10-06 | Senate | Reported as amended |
2014-09-30 | Senate | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |
2014-09-22 | Senate | In the Senate |
2014-09-22 | House | Third consideration and final passage (119-79) |
2014-09-22 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2014-09-17 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2014-09-17 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2014-09-16 | House | Removed from table |
2014-09-15 | House | Laid on the table |
2014-09-15 | House | First consideration |
2014-09-15 | House | Reported as amended |
2013-06-20 | House | Referred to ENVIRONMENTAL RESOURCES AND ENERGY |