PA HB1538 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-3)
Status: Passed on November 25 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-25 - Act No. 124
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 61 (Prisons and Parole) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for parole procedure.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In Pennsylvania Board of Probation and Parole, further providing for parole procedure.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-11-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-18 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 3666, CONCUR (Y: 168 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1538 PN 3666, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 46 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-22 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Re-Reported as Committed (Y: 21 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-29 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Reported as Amended (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - House - House Floor: HB 1538 PN 1955, FP (Y: 194 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-11 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-11-25HouseAct No. 124
2020-11-25HouseApproved by the Governor
2020-11-19HousePresented to the Governor
2020-11-18HouseSigned in Senate
2020-11-18HouseSigned in House
2020-11-18HouseHouse concurred in Senate amendments (168-33)
2020-11-18HouseRe-reported on concurrence, as committed
2020-10-26HouseReferred to RULES
2020-10-21HouseIn the House
2020-10-21SenateThird consideration and final passage (46-3)
2020-09-09SenateRemoved from table
2020-09-09SenateLaid on the table
2020-06-22SenateRe-reported as committed
2020-05-13SenateRe-referred to APPROPRIATIONS
2020-05-13SenateSecond consideration
2020-04-29SenateFirst consideration
2020-04-29SenateReported as amended
2019-06-21SenateReferred to JUDICIARY
2019-06-19SenateIn the Senate
2019-06-19HouseThird consideration and final passage (194-7)
2019-06-19HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-18HouseRe-committed to APPROPRIATIONS
2019-06-18HouseSecond consideration
2019-06-18HouseRe-reported as committed
2019-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2019-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2019-06-11HouseReported as committed
2019-06-03HouseReferred to JUDICIARY

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2019&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1538
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1538&pn=1955
Texthttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2019&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1538&pn=3666
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=24&theDate=06/11/2019&RollCallId=701
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/18/2019&RollCallId=784
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=499
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=4&theDate=06/19/2019&RollCallId=848
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=39&theDate=04/29/2020&RollCallId=841
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummary.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&chamber=S&cteeCde=3&theDate=06/22/2020&RollCallId=981
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=S&rc_nbr=707
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/CFDOCS/Legis/RC/Public/rc_view_action2.cfm?sess_yr=2019&sess_ind=0&rc_body=H&rc_nbr=1729
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2019&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=11/18/2020&RollCallId=2629

Bill Comments

feedback