PA HB1531 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Introduced on June 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-06-13 - Re-reported as committed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

An Act amending Title 65 (Public Officers) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in open meetings, further providing for public notice and providing for notification of agency business required and exceptions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

In open meetings, further providing for public notice and providing for notification of agency business required and exceptions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House State Government: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 23 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A07270 (Y: 11 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-06-06 - House - House State Government: Adopt Amendment A05943 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-06-13HouseRe-reported as committed
2018-06-11HouseRe-committed to RULES
2018-06-11HouseFirst consideration
2018-06-11HouseReported as amended
2017-06-12HouseReferred to STATE GOVERNMENT

Pennsylvania State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/billinfo/bill_history.cfm?syear=2017&sind=0&body=H&type=B&bn=1531
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1531&pn=1978
Texthttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/PN/Public/btCheck.cfm?txtType=PDF&sessYr=2017&sessInd=0&billBody=H&billTyp=B&billNbr=1531&pn=3660
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/06/2018&RollCallId=1607
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/06/2018&RollCallId=1608
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=36&theDate=06/06/2018&RollCallId=1609
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.state.pa.us/cfdocs/legis/RCC/PUBLIC/listVoteSummaryH.cfm?sYear=2017&sInd=0&cteeCde=44&theDate=06/13/2018&RollCallId=1669

Bill Comments

feedback