PA HB1531 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 13 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-22 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in adoption, further providing for alternative procedure for relinquishment.
Title
In adoption, further providing for alternative procedure for relinquishment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-13 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1531 PN 2301, FP (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Floor: HB 1531 PN 2301, FP (Y: 190 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-06-06 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-22 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-06-13 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-13 | House | Third consideration and final passage (190-1) |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-08 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-08 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-07 | House | Removed from table |
2016-06-06 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-06-06 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-06 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-10-05 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |