PA HB1530 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 17 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-10-26 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 23 (Domestic Relations) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in petition for adoption, further providing for consents necessary to adoption.
Title
In petition for adoption, further providing for consents necessary to adoption.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-10-17 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1530 PN 2300, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-17 - House - House Floor: HB 1530 PN 2300, FP (Y: 192 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2016-09-21 - House - House Children And Youth: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-10-26 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-10-17 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-10-17 | House | Third consideration and final passage (192-0) |
2016-10-17 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-09-28 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-09-28 | House | Second consideration |
2016-09-27 | House | Removed from table |
2016-09-21 | House | Laid on the table |
2016-09-21 | House | First consideration |
2016-09-21 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-10-05 | House | Referred to CHILDREN AND YOUTH |