PA HB1516 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 15A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-30 - Act No. 15A of 2021
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the restricted revenue accounts within the Fantasy Contest Fund and Video Gaming Fund to the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2022, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021; and making additional appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania State Police for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020.
Title
Making appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund and from the restricted revenue accounts within the Fantasy Contest Fund and Video Gaming Fund to the Attorney General, the Department of Revenue, the Pennsylvania State Police and the Pennsylvania Gaming Control Board for the fiscal year beginning July 1, 2021, to June 30, 2022, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2021; and making additional appropriations from the restricted revenue accounts within the State Gaming Fund to the Pennsylvania State Police for the fiscal year July 1, 2020, to June 30, 2021, and for the payment of bills incurred and remaining unpaid at the close of the fiscal year ending June 30, 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: HB 1516 PN 1611, Final Passage (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1516 PN 1611, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Appropriations: Reported as Committed (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - House - House Floor: HB 1516 PN 1611, FP (Y: 202 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-26 - House - House Appropriations: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Act No. 15A of 2021 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Approved by the Governor |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Presented to the Governor |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in Senate |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Signed in House |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Third consideration and final passage (50-0) |
2021-06-22 | Senate | Second consideration |
2021-06-21 | Senate | First consideration |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported as committed |
2021-06-17 | Senate | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-16 | Senate | In the Senate |
2021-06-16 | House | Third consideration and final passage (202-0) |
2021-06-16 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2021-06-07 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2021-06-07 | House | Second consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Removed from table |
2021-05-26 | House | Laid on the table |
2021-05-26 | House | First consideration |
2021-05-26 | House | Reported as committed |
2021-05-25 | House | Referred to APPROPRIATIONS |