PA HB1516 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on October 19 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-10-19 - Act No. 76
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
An Act amending the act of May 31, 1933 (P.L.1108, No.272), entitled, as amended, "An act providing for the appointment, promotion, reduction, removal and reinstatement of paid officers, firemen and employes of fire departments and of fire alarm operators and fire box inspectors in the bureaus of electricity in cities of the third class; defining the powers and duties of civil service commissions for such purposes; and fixing penalties," further providing for examinations, for applications, for eligibility lists, for vacancies and promotions and for physical examinations.
Title
An Act amending the act of May 31, 1933 (P.L.1108, No.272), entitled, as amended, "An act providing for the appointment, promotion, reduction, removal and reinstatement of paid officers, firemen and employes of fire departments and of fire alarm operators and fire box inspectors in the bureaus of electricity in cities of the third class; defining the powers and duties of civil service commissions for such purposes; and fixing penalties," further providing for examinations, for applications, for eligibility lists, for vacancies and promotions and for physical examinations.
Sponsors
Rep. Thomas Caltagirone [D] | Rep. Robert Freeman [D] | Rep. Mauree Gingrich [R] | Rep. Richard Grucela [D] |
Rep. David Kessler [D] | Rep. Chris Ross [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-10-04 - House - HB 1516 PN 4284, CONCUR (Y: 197 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 1516 PN 4284, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1516 PN 2062, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-09-29 - Senate - HB 1516 PN 4284, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-07-15 - House - HB 1516 PN 2062, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 196 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-19 | Act No. 76 | |
2010-10-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Presented to the Governor | |
2010-10-12 | Signed in Senate | |
2010-10-04 | Signed in House | |
2010-10-04 | House concurred in Senate amendments | |
2010-10-04 | Reported as committed | |
2010-09-29 | Referred to RULES | |
2010-09-29 | In the House | |
2010-09-29 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2010-09-22 | Second consideration | |
2010-09-21 | Re-reported as amended | |
2010-03-17 | Re-referred to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2010-02-02 | First consideration | |
2010-02-02 | Reported as amended | |
2009-07-17 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT | |
2009-07-15 | In the Senate | |
2009-07-15 | Third consideration and final passage | |
2009-07-09 | Second consideration | |
2009-07-08 | Removed from table | |
2009-07-08 | Laid on the table | |
2009-06-16 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-15 | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS | |
2009-06-15 | Re-reported as committed | |
2009-06-09 | Re-committed to RULES | |
2009-06-09 | First consideration | |
2009-06-09 | Reported as amended | |
2009-05-26 | Referred to LOCAL GOVERNMENT |