PA HB1512 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 10 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-22 - Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE
Pending: Senate Banking & Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 40 (Insurance) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for telemedicine.
Title
In regulation of insurers and related persons generally, providing for telemedicine.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-10 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1512 PN 2883, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1512 PN 2786, 2023 A3906 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A03539 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - House - House Floor: HB 1512 PN 2883, FINAL PASSAGE (Y: 197 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-09 - House - House Floor: HB 1512 PN 2786, 2023 A3906 (Y: 201 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Report Bill As Amended (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-25 - House - House Insurance: Adopt Amendment A03539 (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-22 | Senate | Referred to BANKING AND INSURANCE |
2024-04-10 | Senate | In the Senate |
2024-04-10 | House | Third consideration and final passage (197-3) |
2024-04-10 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2024-04-09 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2024-04-09 | House | Second consideration, with amendments |
2024-03-27 | House | Removed from table |
2024-03-25 | House | Laid on the table |
2024-03-25 | House | First consideration |
2024-03-25 | House | Reported as amended |
2023-06-26 | House | Referred to INSURANCE |