PA HB1498 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 14 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-20 - Referred to JUDICIARY
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act amending Title 18 (Crimes and Offenses) of the Pennsylvania Consolidated Statutes, in firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for duties of the Pennsylvania State Police.
Title
In firearms and other dangerous articles, further providing for duties of the Pennsylvania State Police.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-14 - House - House Appropriations: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1498 PN 2110, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-14 - House - House Floor: HB 1498 PN 2110, FP (Y: 195 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2016-06-13 - House - House Rules: Re-report Bill As Committed (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-07 - House - House Judiciary: Report Bill As Committed (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-20 | Senate | Referred to JUDICIARY |
2016-06-14 | Senate | In the Senate |
2016-06-14 | House | Third consideration and final passage (195-0) |
2016-06-14 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-committed to APPROPRIATIONS |
2016-06-13 | House | Second consideration |
2016-06-13 | House | Re-reported as committed |
2016-06-07 | House | Re-committed to RULES |
2016-06-07 | House | First consideration |
2016-06-07 | House | Reported as committed |
2015-08-13 | House | Referred to JUDICIARY |